Global Patent Index - EP 1154068 A4

EP 1154068 A4 2002-09-04 - SOFTENER COMPOSITION

Title (en)

SOFTENER COMPOSITION

Title (de)

WEICHMACHERZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION D'ADOUCISSANT

Publication

EP 1154068 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00974874 A

Priority

  • JP 0007897 W
  • JP 32318099 A
  • JP 2000102428 A
  • JP 2000114097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1154068A1] The purpose of the present invention is to provide a softener composition which suppresses for a long time body smell derived from sweat etc. and is excellent in the softening effect. That is, the present invention relates to a softener composition comprising: (a) a quaternary ammonium compound represented by the formula (1) : <CHEM> wherein R<1> and R<2> independently represent a C12-22 alkyl or alkenyl group, X and Y are independently -COO-, -CONR<7>-, -OCO- or - NR<7>CO-, provided that at least one of X and Y is -COO- or - OCO-, R<7> represents a hydrogen atom or a C1-3 alkyl or hydroxyalkyl group, R<3> and R<4> independently represent a C1-5 alkylene group, R<5> and R<6> represent a C1-3 alkyl or hydroxyalkyl group or R<1>-X-R<3>- and Z<-> is an anionic group, (b) a quaternary ammonium compound represented by the formula (2) : <CHEM> wherein R<8> represents a C12-22 alkyl or alkenyl group, W is a group selected from -COO-, -CONR<7>-, -OCO- and -NR<7>CO-, R<7> represents a hydrogen atom or a C1-3 alkyl or hydroxyalkyl group, preferably a hydrogen atom, R<9> represents a C1-5 alkylene group, R<10> and R<11> represent a C1-3 alkyl or hydroxyalkyl group, R<12> represents a C1-3 alkyl group or -R<26>-OH, R<26> is a C1-5 alkylene group and Z<-> is an anionic group, and a compound selected from the following component (c) or (d) : (c) 0.1 to 15 % by weight of a compound represented by the formula (3) and/or formula (4) : <CHEM> <CHEM> wherein R<13> and R<18> independently represent a C5-19 alkyl or alkenyl group, R<14> and R<15> independently represent a C1-3 alkyl or hydroxyalkyl group and T is -COO-, -OCO-, -CONH-, -NHCO-, <CHEM> or a linkage, R<16> represents a C1-3 alkylene group, R<17> represents a C1-6 alkylene group or -(O-R<19>)n-, R<19> is ethylene group or propylene group and n is a number of 1 to 10 and W<-> is an anionic group, and (d) 0.01 to 15 % by weight of a compound represented by the formula (5) : <CHEM> wherein 2 or 3 groups out of R<20>, R<21>, R<22> and R<23> represent a C8-12 alkyl group, the remainder of them represent a C1-3 alkyl group, a C1-3 hydroxyalkyl group or a C7-15 arylalkyl group and Z<-> is an anionic group.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/645; C11D 1/835; C11D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 1/86 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01); C11D 1/04 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/48 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 1/86 (2013.01); C11D 3/0015 (2013.01); C11D 1/04 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1154068 A1 20011114; EP 1154068 A4 20020904; EP 1154068 B1 20060405; CN 1157511 C 20040714; CN 1336973 A 20020220; DE 60027138 D1 20060518; DE 60027138 T2 20061228; ES 2260065 T3 20061101; WO 0136737 A1 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151110

2016-12-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161228

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151109

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151109

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60027138

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141105

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141013

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141105

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070108

2006-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2260065 T3

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027138 P 20060518

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2006-04-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040311

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 11D 1/645 A, 7C 11D 1/835 B, 7C 11D 3/00 B

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI