Global Patent Index - EP 1154148 A4

EP 1154148 A4 2002-09-25 - MARINE ENGINE FUEL INJECTION DEVICE

Title (en)

MARINE ENGINE FUEL INJECTION DEVICE

Title (de)

EINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG EINER SCHIFFSBRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT DANS UN MOTEUR MARIN

Publication

EP 1154148 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99901946 A

Priority

JP 9900495 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0046497A1] A high-pressure fuel pump (24), a high-pressure fuel filter (26) and a fuel pressure regulator (34) are housed, shut off from the atmospheric air, in a case (40) which is corrosion-resisting and rust-resisting against damage from salt water. A position above the oil surface of an oil tank (10) communicates with the atmospheric air via an atmospheric communication pipe (74). A fuel check valve (76) is installed at the portion of the pipe (74) which is closer to the fuel tank (10), and an air check valve (78) at the portion of the pipe which is closer to the atmosphere. A second breathing pipe (82) communicating with the inside of the case (40) is allowed to communicate between the fuel check valve (76) position and the air check valve (78) position on the pipe (74). Therefore, the inside of the case (40) does not communicate directly with the atmosphere, but communicates only with the pipe (74) communicating with the atmosphere (on the downstream side of an air cleaner in an engine intake path (75)) and the fuel tank (10), thereby preventing the rusting of high-pressure fuel parts, such as the high-pressure fuel pump (24), the high-pressure fuel filter (26) and the fuel pressure regulator (34) due to shut off atmosphere.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/20 (2006.01); F02M 37/10 (2006.01); F02M 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/0052 (2013.01); F02M 37/007 (2013.01); F02M 37/20 (2013.01); F02M 37/10 (2013.01); F02M 37/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AX] US 5404858 A 19950411 - KATO NAOKI [JP]
  • [A] US 5389245 A 19950214 - JAEGER MATTHEW W [US], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 13 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 06 30 June 1997 (1997-06-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 106 (M - 1375) 4 March 1993 (1993-03-04)
  • See also references of WO 0046497A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0046497 A1 20000810; CA 2361754 A1 20000810; EP 1154148 A1 20011114; EP 1154148 A4 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-11-20 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2002-11-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020902

2002-09-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI