Global Patent Index - EP 1155031 A4

EP 1155031 A4 2002-11-27 - AXOR14, A G-PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR

Title (en)

AXOR14, A G-PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR

Title (de)

AXOR14, EIN G-PROTEIN GEKOPPELTER REZEPTOR

Title (fr)

RECEPTEUR COUPLE AUX PROTEINES G, DIT AXOR-14

Publication

EP 1155031 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99962683 A

Priority

  • GB 9824027 A
  • US 9925791 W
  • US 26029899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0026339A2] The AXOR14 polypeptides and polynucleotides and methods for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques are disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing AXOR14 polypeptides and polynucleotides in therapy, and diagnostic assays for such.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705; C12N 5/12; C12N 15/12; C07K 16/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 0022131 A2 20000420 - ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 0031258 A2 20000602 - ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al
  • [Y] XU W F ET AL: "Cloning and characterization of human protease - activated receptor 4", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 95, no. 12, June 1998 (1998-06-01), pages 6642 - 6646, XP002112286, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [Y] RAMING K ET AL: "Identification of a novel G-protein coupled receptor expressed in distinct brain regions and a defined olfactory zone", RECEPTORS AND CHANNELS, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, CH, vol. 6, no. 2, 1998, pages 141 - 151, XP000925988, ISSN: 1060-6823
  • [A] HERZ J M ET AL: "MOLECULAR APPROACHES TO RECEPTORS AS TARGETS FOR DRUG DISCOVERY", JOURNAL OF RECEPTOR AND SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION RESEARCH, MARCEL DEKKER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 17, no. 5, 1997, pages 671 - 676, XP001027053, ISSN: 1079-9893
  • See also references of WO 0026339A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0026339 A2 20000511; WO 0026339 A3 20000713; EP 1155031 A2 20011121; EP 1155031 A4 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): GB

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-01-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): GB

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07K 14/705 A, 7C 12N 5/12 B, 7C 12N 15/12 B, 7C 07K 16/28 B

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE