Global Patent Index - EP 1155167 B1

EP 1155167 B1 2002-11-06 - ELECTROLYTIC CELL ARRANGEMENT FOR PRODUCTION OF ALUMINIUM

Title (en)

ELECTROLYTIC CELL ARRANGEMENT FOR PRODUCTION OF ALUMINIUM

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG VON ELEKTROLYSEZELLEN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ALUMINIUM

Title (fr)

ARRANGEMENT DE CUVES D'ELECTROLYSE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ALUMINIUM

Publication

EP 1155167 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00901689 A

Priority

  • FR 0000228 W
  • FR 9901529 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2789407A1] The invention concerns an electrolytic cell arrangement (1), disposed transversely, for producing aluminium by fused-salt electrolysis in accordance with the Hall-Heroult process, comprising at least a first row of electrolytic cells, forming a first electric circuit, and at least a second electric circuit located at a specific mean distance from the first row. The invention is characterised in that at least one conductor (7), said to be axial, passes beneath each upstream cell, in the central zone, and at least a conductor (8), said to be lateral, passes beneath each upstream cell, in the inner lateral zone, and at least one conductor (11A, 11B), said to be bypassing, bypasses each upstream cell, and said or each lateral conductor is connected to a first set of said cathode bar ends located on the upstream side so as to transmit to said risers (6A, 6B, 6D, 6E) a first part (I1) of the current (Im), ranging between 20 and 20 % of said current (Im), and said or each axial conductor is connected to a second set of cathode bar ends located on the upstream side so as to transmit to said risers (6A, 6B. 6D, 6E) a second part (I2) of said current (Im), ranging between 10 and 20 % of said current Im, and said or each bypassing conductor is connected to a third set of cathode bar ends located on the upstream side so as to transmit a third part (I3) of the current (Im), corresponding to the remainder of the current Im, and said risers are connected to said cathode bar ends located on the downstream side of the corresponding upstream cell, to the conductors passing beneath said cell, and to said or each bypassing conductor of said cell, such that a fraction (Mc) of said current (Io) less than 15 % is transmitted to the risers located in the central zone of the row.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2789407 A1 20000811; FR 2789407 B1 20010323; AR 022463 A1 20020904; AU 2301000 A 20000825; AU 764224 B2 20030814; BR 0007986 A 20011106; CA 2361671 A1 20000810; DE 60000721 D1 20021212; DE 60000721 T2 20030918; EG 21884 A 20020430; EP 1155167 A1 20011121; EP 1155167 B1 20021106; GC 0000125 A 20050629; NO 20013714 A 20011005; NO 20013714 D0 20010727; NZ 512913 A 20030328; RU 2227179 C2 20040420; US 6551473 B1 20030422; WO 0046429 A1 20000810; ZA 200105654 B 20020530

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2007-01-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1155167E

2003-04-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000721 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20010702

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20010702;SI