Global Patent Index - EP 1155223 B1

EP 1155223 B1 2002-12-11 - MULTICYLINDER INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH GAS FLOW LIFT VALVES ACTUATED BY ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATORS

Title (en)

MULTICYLINDER INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH GAS FLOW LIFT VALVES ACTUATED BY ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATORS

Title (de)

MEHRZYLINDRIGE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT VON ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN AKTUATOREN BETÄTIGTEN GASWECHSEL-HUBVENTILEN

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE MULTICYLINDRE POURVU DE SOUPAPES D'ECHANGE DE GAZ ACTIONNEES PAR DES ACTIONNEURS ELECTROMAGNETIQUES

Publication

EP 1155223 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00904881 A

Priority

  • DE 19907850 A
  • EP 0000064 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19907850A1] The invention relates to a multicylinder internal combustion engine with gas flow lift valves actuated by electromagnetic actuators and controlling the intake and the exhaust of the cylinder combustion chambers. The cross-sectional area of the actuators allocated to the intake lift valves which is perpendicular to the axial direction of the lift valves is smaller than the cross-sectional area of the actuators allocated to the exhaust lift valves. If the intake lift valves and the exhaust lift valves are arranged in series one after the other in the direction of the longitudinal axis of the internal combustion engine, the width of the intake actuators measured in the plane of the actuator cross-sectional area and perpendicular to the longitudinal axis of the internal combustion engine is smaller than that of the exhaust actuators. If two intake lift valves and two exhaust lift valves each are provided per cylinder, the distance between the two cylinder exhaust lift valves measured in the direction of the longitudinal axis of the internal combustion engine equals the distance between the two cylinder intake lift valves. An ignition spark provided between the plane of the exhaust lift valves and the plane of the intake lift valves is at least slightly inclined towards the intake actuators with its longitudinal axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 67/00 (2006.01); F01L 1/46 (2006.01); F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F01P 3/14 (2006.01); F01P 3/20 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02F 1/38 (2006.01); F02P 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19907850 A1 20000914; DE 19907850 C2 20020801; EP 1155223 A1 20011121; EP 1155223 B1 20021211; JP 2002543316 A 20021217; US 6568358 B1 20030527; WO 0050741 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000915

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090107

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070107

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090107

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070108

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060105

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1155223E

2003-04-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000915 20030123

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020410

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE