Global Patent Index - EP 1155229 B1

EP 1155229 B1 2002-09-25 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING PRESSURE IN A HIGH PRESSURE FUEL PUMP SUPPLYING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING PRESSURE IN A HIGH PRESSURE FUEL PUMP SUPPLYING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DRUCKREGELUNG EINER HOCHDRUCKKRAFTSTOFFPUMPE FÜR DIE KRAFTSTOFFVERSORGUNG EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONTROLE DE LA PRESSION D'UNE POMPE A CARBURANT A HAUTE PRESSION POUR L'ALIMENTATION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1155229 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00907712 A

Priority

  • FR 0000459 W
  • FR 9902424 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2790283A1] The invention concerns a method and a system for controlling pressure in the high pressure circuit (22) downstream of the pump (11) which consists in monitoring the solenoid (18) on the pump intake (11) so that the fuel mass discharged by the pump (11) into the circuit (22) is equal to the algebraic sum of a fuel volume to be injected into the engine (1) and a fuel volume required to compensate at least partially a pressure difference between the fuel pressure measured by the sensor (4) in the circuit (22) and an objective pressure desired by the control unit (5) in said circuit (22). The invention is useful for controlling pressure for direct fuel injection into engines, in particular with spark ignition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3845 (2013.01); F02D 41/3818 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1433 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790283 A1 20000901; FR 2790283 B1 20020104; DE 60000509 D1 20021031; DE 60000509 T2 20030522; EP 1155229 A1 20011121; EP 1155229 B1 20020925; ES 2182788 T3 20030316; US 6446610 B1 20020910; WO 0050757 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-05-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1155229E

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182788 T3

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000509 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020308

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE