Global Patent Index - EP 1155640 A3

EP 1155640 A3 2003-06-11 - Mounting hook

Title (en)

Mounting hook

Title (de)

Montagehaken

Title (fr)

Crochet de montage

Publication

EP 1155640 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01111321 A

Priority

  • AT 8112000 A
  • AT 16632000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1155640A2] The wall mounting hook comprises a U-shaped frame whose arms (2, 3) are of the same length. One arm (2) has bores (5), allowing it to be screwed to the wall and both arms have flat upper surfaces (6) at the same level, on which e.g. shelves may be mounted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 96/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/00 (2006.01); A47B 96/02 (2006.01); A47B 96/06 (2006.01); A47G 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/06 (2013.01); A47B 47/00 (2013.01); A47B 96/027 (2013.01); A47B 96/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1155640 A2 20011121; EP 1155640 A3 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031212

2004-04-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI