Global Patent Index - EP 1155813 A3

EP 1155813 A3 2002-11-06 - Method of making envelopes from a moving web

Title (en)

Method of making envelopes from a moving web

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Briefhüllen aus einer bewegten Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'enveloppes d'une bande de matériau en mouvement

Publication

EP 1155813 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01111087 A

Priority

DE 10023999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1155813A2] The printer drum (1) is driven by a motor (9) to print envelopes (4) on a conveyor (3) prior to a cutting drum (2) and further conveyors (5,7). A dimension (a) is recorded on a sample piece and corrections to the print drum and cutter drum (8) motors applied by an electronic control unit (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/74; B31B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/16 (2006.01); B31B 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 50/00 (2017.08); B31B 50/006 (2017.08); B31B 50/16 (2017.08); B31B 50/88 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1155813 A2 20011121; EP 1155813 A3 20021106; DE 10023999 A1 20011122; US 2001044364 A1 20011122

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-09-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030321

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI