Global Patent Index - EP 1155876 A3

EP 1155876 A3 2003-06-04 - Improved folding file for filing documents which can also be used as a desk

Title (en)

Improved folding file for filing documents which can also be used as a desk

Title (de)

Faltordner für Dokumente auch als Lesepult verwendbar

Title (fr)

Classeur pour documents, utilisable comme pupitre de lecture

Publication

EP 1155876 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01201490 A

Priority

NL 1015033 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1155876A2] The invention relates to a, in a very surprisingly way improved folding file (1) for filing documents and which can also be turned up into a desk, in which the folding file (1) consists of a threesome by means of folds (10, 11, 12, 13, 14) connected flexural stiff with plastic provided sheet parts (2, 5, 6) with between the first sheet part (2) and the second sheet part (5) a back part (3) with in addition a multiple articulated flexible in opposite direction foldable or butt hinged intermediate part (4), which for the folding file (1) in raised condition forms the supporting edge (14) for books and sheets. The third sheet part (6) is fixed in raised position by a slot (15) in the first sheet part (2), by which further the folding file is provided with insert files (8, 9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 13/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/06 (2006.01); B42F 13/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/06 (2013.01); B42F 13/402 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

NL 1015033 C1 20000606; EP 1155876 A2 20011121; EP 1155876 A3 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031101

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI