Global Patent Index - EP 1155955 A3

EP 1155955 A3 2002-12-11 - Hatch cover

Title (en)

Hatch cover

Title (de)

Lukendeckel

Title (fr)

Panneau d'écoutille

Publication

EP 1155955 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01870098 A

Priority

BE 200000334 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1155955A2] Nestable hatch cover (1), in particular of the "Frisian cap" type, for covering a hatchway giving access to a vessel's hold (3), which hatchway is bounded by two hatch beams (4) situated opposite each other. The hatch cover (1) has two end parts (12) situated opposite each other, each provided underneath with a bearing surface which is designed to rest upon said hatch beams (4), and each forming an outermost end of the hatch cover. In order to keep the clear width of the gangways of the vessel as great as possible or to be able to make the hatchway as wide as possible, in particular so wide that the maximum number of containers can be stacked in the hold (3), the bearing surfaces below the end parts (12) are bounded on their outside by at least one projection (27) projecting below said bearing surfaces, which projection in each case is situated substantially at one of the abovementioned outermost ends of the hatch cover (1). Compared with the known hatch covers, this hatch cover therefore projects less far beyond the hatch beams. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 19/16; B63B 19/14; B63B 19/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 19/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 19/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1155955 A2 20011121; EP 1155955 A3 20021211; EP 1155955 B1 20060719; AT 333406 T 20060815; BE 1013711 A5 20020604; DE 60121500 D1 20060831; DE 60121500 T2 20070222

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 60121500

- Effective date: 20130926

2013-05-29 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20130413

2013-05-29 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20130413

2013-04-13 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60121500

2013-04-13 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 60121500

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120503

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120501

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110603

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070510

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BLOMMAERT, BESLOTEN VENNOOTSCHAP MET BEPERKTE AANS

2007-05-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BLOMMAERT, BESLOTEN VENNOOTSCHAP MET BEPERKTE AANS

- Effective date: 20070419

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061219

2006-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061030

2006-10-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60121500 P 20060831

2006-08-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAECK, ARTHUR GERARD M.

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAECK, ARTHUR GERARD M.

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63B 19/16 A, 7B 63B 19/24 B, 7B 63B 19/14 B

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI