Global Patent Index - EP 1156212 A3

EP 1156212 A3 2003-06-11 - Piston machine with cylinder sleeves for the reciprocating pistons

Title (en)

Piston machine with cylinder sleeves for the reciprocating pistons

Title (de)

Kolbenmaschine mit in Führungsbuchsen einer Zylindertrommel verschiebbar gelagerten Kolben

Title (fr)

Machine à piston alternatif avec des chemises de cylindre pour les pistons

Publication

EP 1156212 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01102330 A

Priority

DE 10023849 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1156212A2] The engine has a cylinder drum (5), in which several pistons (9) slide in guide sleeves (8). The guide sleeves are inserted and fixed with their head ends (8c) in sleeve holes (6) in the cylinder drum. The pistons form working chambers (11) in the cylinder drum at their head ends (9a) and are supported at their foot ends (9b) at a drive part of the engine. The inner surfaces (8b) of the guide sleeves each have a cross-section expansion (32) in the end areas (a) of their head ends. An Independent claim is included for a guide sleeve for a piston engine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/12; F04B 53/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/12 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/124 (2013.01); F04B 53/166 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1156212 A2 20011121; EP 1156212 A3 20030611; EP 1156212 B1 20100428; DE 10023849 A1 20011129; DE 10023849 B4 20051117; DE 50115453 D1 20100610

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115453

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140201

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-10-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100428

2010-06-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115453 P 20100610

2010-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2010-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-11-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AXIAL PISTON MACHINE WITH CYLINDER SLEEVES FOR THE RECIPROCATING PISTONS

2008-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080520

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI