Global Patent Index - EP 1156221 A3

EP 1156221 A3 2002-11-06 - Gear pump

Title (en)

Gear pump

Title (de)

Zahnradförderpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à engrenages

Publication

EP 1156221 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01108910 A

Priority

DE 10024884 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1156221A2] The gear pump has a pump chamber (14) formed by a casing part (10) and a cover part (12), in which a pair of meshing gears (16,18) is arranged. The pump conveys medium from a suction chamber connected to a supply tank along supply channels (44) formed between the gears and the walls of the pump chamber to a pressure chamber. The cover part is arranged opposite the end faces of the gears. The cover part has a depression (50) on its inner side, which has a cross-section that is at least as large as the end faces of the gears. A plate-shaped cover element (52) between the cover part and the end faces of the gears covers at least the depression, so that the cover face is clamped against the end faces of the gears, when the pump is not in operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/18; F04C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1156221 A2 20011121; EP 1156221 A3 20021106; DE 10024884 A1 20011122; US 2002021978 A1 20020221; US 6527529 B2 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI