EP 1156276 A1 20011121 - Controllable valve in particular for delivering a pulsating fluid flow
Title (en)
Controllable valve in particular for delivering a pulsating fluid flow
Title (de)
Steuerbares Ventil, insbesondere zur Zuführung eines pulsierenden Durchflusses
Title (fr)
Vanne commandable notamment pour délivrer un débit pulsé de fluide
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 0006311 A 20000517
Abstract (en)
There is a mechanical bush (40'), and a arrangement (38) compressible under the force which is applied to it, including a first end fixed to the mechanical bush, and second rigid members (36') for kinematically connecting one of the faces of the movable flap (22b) to the second end of the compressible arrangement (38). The valve body (10) has a valve seat (12) separating the interior of the body into an inlet chamber (14) and an exit chamber (16), and a movable flap (22), and an actuator (24) having a fixed control part (26) for receiving the control signal, and a movable part (28). There are first rigid connectors (30) for connecting this movable part of the actuator (28) to the movable flap (22).
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F16K 31/06 (2006.01); F23C 15/00 (2006.01); F23K 5/00 (2006.01); F23K 5/14 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
F23K 5/007 (2013.01 - EP US); F23K 5/147 (2013.01 - EP US); F23C 2205/00 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10T 137/0379 (2015.04 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] DE 3337259 A1 19850425 - ATLAS FAHRZEUGTECHNIK GMBH [DE]
- [A] EP 0473451 A1 19920304 - VARIAN AUSTRALIA [AU]
- [A] US 3043366 A 19620710 - WENTWORTH HARRY T
- [AD] EP 0524880 A1 19930127 - AIR LIQUIDE [FR]
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 267 (M - 182) 25 December 1982 (1982-12-25)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 071 (M - 567) 4 March 1987 (1987-03-04)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 071 (M - 126) 6 May 1982 (1982-05-06)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1156276 A1 20011121; AR 028559 A1 20030514; AU 4205801 A 20011122; AU 776294 B2 20040902; BR 0102022 A 20011218; CA 2348088 A1 20011117; FR 2809155 A1 20011123; FR 2809155 B1 20030103; JP 2002022051 A 20020123; US 2001044083 A1 20011122; US 6679278 B2 20040120
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01401245 A 20010515; AR P010102287 A 20010514; AU 4205801 A 20010503; BR 0102022 A 20010517; CA 2348088 A 20010515; FR 0006311 A 20000517; JP 2001146290 A 20010516; US 84833801 A 20010504