Global Patent Index - EP 1156759 A4

EP 1156759 A4 2002-11-20 - BIODEGRADABLE POLYMERIPROTEIN BASED COILS FOR INTRALUMENAL IMPLANTS

Title (en)

BIODEGRADABLE POLYMERIPROTEIN BASED COILS FOR INTRALUMENAL IMPLANTS

Title (de)

AUF BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBAREM POLYMERPROTEIN BASIERENDE SPIRALEN FÜR INTRALUMINALE IMPLANTATE

Title (fr)

SPIRALES A BASE DE POLYMERE/PROTEINE BIODEGRADABLE, POUR IMPLANTS ENDOLUMINAUX

Publication

EP 1156759 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99951622 A

Priority

  • US 9922420 W
  • US 9901790 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0044306A1] An endovascular cellular manipulation and inflammatory response are elicited from implantation in a vascular compartment or any intraluminal location of a separable coil comprised at least in part of at least one biocompatible and absorbable polymer or protein and growth factors. Typically a catheter associated with the separable coil is used to dispose the coil into a selected body lumen. The biocompatible and absorbable polymer or protein is thrombogenic. The coil further is comprised at least in part of a growth factor or more particularly a vascular endothelial growth factor, a basic fibroblast growth factor or other growth factors. The biocompatible and absorbable polymer is in the illustrated embodiment at least one polymer selected from the group consisting of polyglycolic acid, poly SIMILAR glycolic acid/poly-L-lactic acid copolymers, polycaprolactive, polyhydroxybutyrate/hydroxyvalerate copolymers, poly-L-lactide. Polydioxanone, polycarbonates, and polyanhydrides. The biocompatible and absorbable protein is at least one protein selected from the group consisting of collagen, fibrinogen, fibronectin, vitronectin, laminin, and gelatin. In one embodiment the coil is composed of the biocompatible and absorbable polymer or protein with a radio-opaque material is disposed thereon. Alternatively, the coil is composed of a radio-opaque material, and the biocompatible and absorbable polymer or protein is disposed thereon. This apparatus may be positioned within intracranial aneurysms or any aneurysm in the body as well as within other body cavities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/06; A61B 17/12; A61L 31/04; A61L 31/06; A61L 31/08; A61L 31/10; A61L 31/14; A61L 31/16; A61M 5/00; A61M 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/12 (2006.01); A61F 2/04 (2013.01); A61K 38/27 (2006.01); A61L 27/00 (2006.01); A61L 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/14 (2006.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/12022 (2013.01); A61B 17/1215 (2013.01); A61F 2/04 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30062 (2013.01); A61F 2002/3008 (2013.01); A61F 2210/0004 (2013.01); A61F 2250/0098 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9944538 A1 19990910 - UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al
  • [A] US 5830879 A 19981103 - ISNER JEFFREY M [US]
  • [A] US 5549624 A 19960827 - MIRIGIAN GREGORY E [US], et al
  • [A] US 5837008 A 19981117 - BERG ERIC P [US], et al
  • [A] US 4994069 A 19910219 - RITCHART MARK [US], et al
  • [X] MURAYAMA Y ET AL: "ION IMPLANTATION AND PROTEIN COATING OF DETACHABLE COILS FOR ENDOVASCULAR TREATMENT OF CEREBRAL ANEURYSMS: CONCEPTS AND PRELIMINARY RESULTS IN SWINE MODELS", NEUROSURGERY, MCGRAW-HILL, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 40, no. 6, 1 June 1997 (1997-06-01), pages 1233 - 1244, XP002081170
  • [X] MURAYAMA Y ET AL: "A new surface modification technique of platinum coils by ion implantation and protein coating: Use in intravascular treatment of brain aneurysms", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - B: BEAM INTERACTIONS WITH MATERIALS AND ATOMS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 127-128, 1 May 1997 (1997-05-01), pages 1015 - 1018, XP004096894, ISSN: 0168-583X
  • See also references of WO 0044306A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0044306 A1 20000803; AU 6402699 A 20000818; CA 2323151 A1 20000803; CA 2323151 C 20070410; EP 1156759 A1 20011128; EP 1156759 A4 20021120; JP 2003524456 A 20030819; JP 2004223268 A 20040812; JP 2006021052 A 20060126; JP 4751661 B2 20110817

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20091108

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050530

2002-11-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61F 2/06 A, 7A 61M 5/00 B, 7A 61M 5/24 B, 7A 61L 31/04 B, 7A 61L 31/06 B, 7A 61L 31/08 B, 7A 61L 31/10 B, 7A 61L 31/14 B, 7A 61L 31/16 B, 7A 61B 17/12 B

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000906

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20000906;LV PAYMENT 20000906;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000906