Global Patent Index - EP 1156816 A4

EP 1156816 A4 2004-12-29 - PEPTIDES MODULATING ACTIVITIES OF HEPARIN, OTHER GLYCOSAMINOGLYCANS OR PROTEOGLYCANS

Title (en)

PEPTIDES MODULATING ACTIVITIES OF HEPARIN, OTHER GLYCOSAMINOGLYCANS OR PROTEOGLYCANS

Title (de)

PEPTIDE DIE DIE AKTIVITÄTEN VON HEPARIN UND ANDEREN GLYKOSAMINOGLYKANEN ODER PROTEOGLYKANEN MODULIEREN

Title (fr)

ACTIVITES DE MODULATION DES PEPTIDES DE L'HEPARINE, ET D'AUTRES GLYCOSAMINOGLYCANES OU PROTEOGLYCANES

Publication

EP 1156816 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00905964 A

Priority

  • US 0002853 W
  • US 11827699 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0045831A1] The present invention involves peptides of various sequences and sizes and methods of using said peptides with a strong affinity for glycosaminoglycans and proteoglycans, wherein said peptides interact strongly with heparin, other glycosaminoglycans, or proteoglycans (PGs).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; C07K 5/00; C07K 7/00; C07K 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 7/08 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 7/08 (2013.01); C07K 14/001 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] WO 9513083 A1 19950518 - UNIV MICHIGAN THE BOARD OF REG [US], et al
  • [X] CHILLEMI FRANCESCO ET AL: "Synthesis and cytotoxic activity of new peptides containing basic amino acid residues", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, vol. 18, no. 2A, March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 757 - 758, XP009034295, ISSN: 0250-7005
  • [PX] VERRECCHIO ANGELA ET AL: "Design of peptides with high affinities for heparin and endothelial cell proteoglycans", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 275, no. 11, 17 March 2000 (2000-03-17), pages 7701 - 7707, XP002289447, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • See also references of WO 0045831A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0045831 A1 20000810; CA 2361612 A1 20000810; EP 1156816 A1 20011128; EP 1156816 A4 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050127

2004-12-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041108

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE