EP 1156886 A4 20020828 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR APPLYING FLUX TO A SUBSTRATE
Title (en)
APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR APPLYING FLUX TO A SUBSTRATE
Title (de)
VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON FLUX AUF EIN SUBSTRAT
Title (fr)
DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER DU FLUX A UN SUBSTRAT
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 0000427 W 20000107
- US 22724399 A 19990107
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0040343A1] An apparatus and method is provided for applying a liquid solder flux in a pattern to a substrate. A stencil is utilized which comprises first apertures (16) corresponding in location to the pattern and second apertures (32) in fluid communication with the first apertures, the second apertures being disposed adjacent an upper surface of the substrate. The first apertures are disposed in a first section (26) of the stencil and the second apertures are disposed in a second section (28) of the stencil. The first section (26) and the second section (28) meet at a planar intersection substantially parallel to first and second sides of the stencil. The planar intersection has a cross section different from that of the first and second sections.
IPC 1-7
B05C 17/06; B05D 1/32; B23K 37/06; G03F 7/22; B23K 20/00; H01L 21/60; B41N 1/24; B41C 1/14
IPC 8 full level
B23K 1/20 (2006.01); H05K 3/12 (2006.01); G03F 7/12 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B23K 1/203 (2013.01); H05K 3/1225 (2013.01); G03F 7/12 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XA] US 5356658 A 19941018 - HERTZ ALLEN D [US], et al
- [X] DE 1960723 A1 19710609 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
- [X] US 4323593 A 19820406 - TSUNASHIMA EIICHI
- [X] GB 2320462 A 19980624 - MICRO METALLIC LTD [GB]
- [X] US 5373786 A 19941220 - UMABA TAKAYUKI [JP]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 661 (E - 1644) 14 December 1994 (1994-12-14)
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 579 (E - 1299) 18 December 1992 (1992-12-18)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 059 (E - 1166) 14 February 1992 (1992-02-14)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 124 (M - 1097) 26 March 1991 (1991-03-26)
- See references of WO 0040343A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0040343 A1 20000713; AU 2409500 A 20000724; EP 1156886 A1 20011128; EP 1156886 A4 20020828
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0000427 W 20000107; AU 2409500 A 20000107; EP 00902365 A 20000107