Global Patent Index - EP 1156895 B1

EP 1156895 B1 2003-06-11 - CRIMPING RING, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME AND MANUFACTURING INSTALLATION

Title (en)

CRIMPING RING, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME AND MANUFACTURING INSTALLATION

Title (de)

KLEMMRING, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

BAGUE A RETREINDRE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION.

Publication

EP 1156895 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00907722 A

Priority

  • FR 0000469 W
  • FR 9902476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2790213A1] In order to connect a linking element (12) to one end (10A, 10B) of the strip (10) from which the crimping ring (10) is made, the linking element is arranged against said end such that at least one anchoring edge (14) of the linking element (12) is opposite said end and pressure is exerted on the linking element (12) so as to force back the material of said end (10A, 10B) of the strip which is beneath the linking element (12) while providing in said end a fixing member (15) capable of co-operating with said anchoring edge to retain one with respect to the other linking element and said strip end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/03; B21D 53/16; F16B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/03 (2006.01); B21D 53/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/16 (2013.01); B21D 39/037 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1457 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1469 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1473 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1478 (2013.01); Y10T 24/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790213 A1 20000901; FR 2790213 B1 20010518; AR 022747 A1 20020904; AU 2921500 A 20000914; BR 0008198 A 20020205; DE 60003290 D1 20030717; DE 60003290 T2 20040506; EP 1156895 A1 20011128; EP 1156895 B1 20030611; ES 2200830 T3 20040316; JP 2002537122 A 20021105; TW 527237 B 20030411; US 6557216 B1 20030506; WO 0050182 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120226

2013-10-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131030

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120225

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120226

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070225

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070225

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200830 T3

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031018

2003-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003290 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE