Global Patent Index - EP 1156896 B1

EP 1156896 B1 2002-11-20 - CRIMPING RING AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

CRIMPING RING AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

KLEMMRING UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

BAGUE A RETREINDRE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1156896 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00907723 A

Priority

  • FR 0000470 W
  • FR 9902477 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2790214A1] The invention concerns a crimping ring comprising a metal strip (10) wound on itself. One first linking element arranged at the first end (12) comprises a first surface (16) overlying an indentation and at least a female member (18) hollowed out from said first surface. A second linking element provided at the second end (14) comprises a second surface (20) overlying an indentation and a male member (22) shaped by a projection from said second surface. To produce the link, the male member (22) is engaged in the female member (18) and fixed thereto, while the overlying surfaces (16, 20) are arranged against each other so as to define a linking zone whereof the thickness is substantially equal to the current thickness of the strip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/03; B21D 53/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/36 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1457 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1463 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1467 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1469 (2013.01); Y10T 24/148 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1488 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790214 A1 20000901; FR 2790214 B1 20010518; AU 2921600 A 20000914; DE 60000821 D1 20030102; DE 60000821 T2 20030904; EP 1156896 A1 20011128; EP 1156896 B1 20021120; ES 2185569 T3 20030501; US 6481061 B1 20021119; WO 0050183 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070225

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070226

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070226

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070225

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070225

2007-10-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070226

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1156896E

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185569 T3

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000821 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE