Global Patent Index - EP 1157205 B1

EP 1157205 B1 2002-09-11 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A CONTROL VALVE FOR A DIESEL FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A CONTROL VALVE FOR A DIESEL FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG EINES STEUERVENTILS FÜR EIN DIESEL-EINSPRITZSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REGULATION D'UNE SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE DE SYSTEME D'INJECTION POUR MOTEUR DIESEL

Publication

EP 1157205 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00916760 A

Priority

  • DE 0000521 W
  • DE 19908812 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0052326A1] The invention relates to a system and a method for controlling a control valve for a diesel fuel injection system, comprising a fuel injector with a pressure amplifier. The control valve (10) is positioned upstream of the pressure amplifier. The valve spool (20) of the control valve (10) is moved back and forth by two physically separate magnetic coils (30, 32). When one of said two magnetic coils (30; 32) is electrically controlled by a control current the other magnetic coil (32; 30) is switched to a sensor function so that the current induced in the sensor by a movement of the valve spool (20) is detected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/46; F02M 57/02; F02M 59/10; F02M 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/004 (2013.01); F02M 57/025 (2013.01); F02M 59/105 (2013.01); F02M 59/466 (2013.01); F02M 65/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0052326 A1 20000908; EP 1157205 A1 20011128; EP 1157205 B1 20020911; US 2002029765 A1 20020314; US 6494187 B2 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070224

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060224

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060224

2005-04-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1157205E

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000490 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE