Global Patent Index - EP 1157779 A3

EP 1157779 A3 2002-09-11 - C-Axis driving system for machine tools

Title (en)

C-Axis driving system for machine tools

Title (de)

Drehantriebssystem für Werkzeugmaschinen

Title (fr)

Système d'entraînement rotatif pour machine-outils

Publication

EP 1157779 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01113031 A

Priority

JP 2000156815 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1157779A2] In a C-axis driving system for machine tools including a worm wheel mounted on a spindle rotatably supported by a headstock, a worm shaft with a worm formed therein directed perpendicular to an axis of the spindle and placed so as to be pivotable about a pivotal shaft between an engagement position where the worm shaft is engaged with the worm wheel and a disengagement position where the worm shaft is disengaged therefrom, and a C-axis driving motor connected to the worm shaft and serving for rotationally indexing the spindle to a specified rotational angle, wherein the worm shaft is rotatably supported by a worm shaft base, the pivotal shaft is provided on the worm shaft base so as to be directed perpendicular to an axis of the worm shaft, and the pivotal shaft is supported by the headstock. Thus, the C-axis driving system for machine tools is capable of suppressing the upsizing of the C-axis unit as well as the increase in cost while implementing a smooth engagement with the worm wheel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 5/40; B23Q 16/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23Q 16/06 (2006.01); B23Q 16/02 (2006.01); F16H 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23Q 16/025 (2013.01); B23B 3/10 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5165 (2013.01); Y10T 74/19565 (2013.01); Y10T 74/19614 (2013.01); Y10T 74/19828 (2013.01); Y10T 82/2511 (2013.01); Y10T 82/2552 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1157779 A2 20011128; EP 1157779 A3 20020911; EP 1157779 B1 20040728; DE 60104480 D1 20040902; DE 60104480 T2 20041125; JP 2001334443 A 20011204; JP 4643796 B2 20110302; US 2002017888 A1 20020214; US 6626058 B2 20030930

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050528

2005-07-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050528

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60104480 P 20040902

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UEDA, TOSHIO

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UEMURA, YOSHITANE

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SASABE, NOBUAKI

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030307

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI