Global Patent Index - EP 1158067 B1

EP 1158067 B1 2007-10-17 - Martensitic hardenable heat treatable steel with improved thermal resistance and ductility

Title (en)

Martensitic hardenable heat treatable steel with improved thermal resistance and ductility

Title (de)

Martensitisch-härtbarer Vergütungsstahl mit verbesserter Warmfestigkeit und Duktilität

Title (fr)

Acier de traitement thermique durcissable martensitique à résistance thermique ameliorée et à ductilité ameliorée

Publication

EP 1158067 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01108810 A

Priority

DE 10025808 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1158067A1] Heat-treatable steel contains (in weight %): 9-13 Cr, 0.001-0.25 Mn, 2-7 Ni, 0.001-8 Co, 0.5-4 of at least one of W and Mo, 0.5-0.8 V, 0.001-0.1 of at least one of Nb, Ta, Zr and Hf, 0.001-0.05 Ti, 0.001-0.15 Si, 0.01-0.1 C, 0.12-0.18 N, maximum 0.025 P, maximum 0.015 S, maximum 0.01 Al, maximum 0.0012 Sb, maximum 0.007 Sn, maximum 0.012 As and a balance of iron. The weight ratio of vanadium to nitrogen is 3.5 to 4.2. An Independent claim is also included for a process heat treating the above heat-treatable steel comprising solution annealing at 1050-1250 degrees C; cooling to less than 300 degrees C; tempering and partially or completely re-austenizing at 600-900 degrees C; cooling to less than 300 degrees C; and annealing at 550-650 degrees C.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/52 (2006.01); C21D 6/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/48 (2006.01); C22C 38/50 (2006.01); C21D 6/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/48 (2013.01); C21D 6/004 (2013.01); C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C22C 38/46 (2013.01); C22C 38/50 (2013.01); C22C 38/52 (2013.01); C21D 6/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1158067 A1 20011128; EP 1158067 B1 20071017; DE 10025808 A1 20011129; DE 50113134 D1 20071129; JP 2002004012 A 20020109; US 2002003008 A1 20020110; US 6464804 B2 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50113134

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120407

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120407

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080130

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113134 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI