Global Patent Index - EP 1158083 A3

EP 1158083 A3 2002-09-04 - Device for changing the upper thread

Title (en)

Device for changing the upper thread

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Wechseln des Oberfadens

Title (fr)

Dispositif de changement du fil supérieur

Publication

EP 1158083 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01109822 A

Priority

DE 10026242 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1158083A2] The apparatus to change the upper thread at a sewing machine, and especially a robot, uses a bobbin magazine (1). The robot (2) with its sewing head (15) is mounted at the workstation, which has the thread cutter and thread splicer. The bobbin magazine (1) with the bobbin change unit (12) is fitted close to the robot. The upper thread change system, at a robot sewing machine, has a bobbin magazine where a fixed holder arm is at each bobbin (5), with at least two thread clamps which hold the thread over the bobbin axis. Each bobbin is held in place by a sprung and sliding pin. The bobbin change unit has a bobbin grip on a moving slide, and at least two thread grips. The bobbin grip moves the bobbin from the magazine to the workstation and back. The two thread grips at the bobbin change unit are mounted on a rotating arm. Two controlled thread holders, at the workstation, are on an arm with vertical movement, with cutting scissors under the first thread holder. The thread splicer at the workstation is to one side of the thread movement path, and it can swing into the thread path.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 43/00; B65H 67/02; D05B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 69/00 (2006.01); D05B 43/00 (2006.01); D05C 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 11/16 (2013.01); B65H 69/00 (2013.01); D05B 43/00 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1158083 A2 20011128; EP 1158083 A3 20020904; EP 1158083 B1 20041215; DE 10026242 A1 20011129; JP 2001340677 A 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150421

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150421

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150421

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50104805

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-11-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104805 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 05B 43/00 A, 7D 05B 23/00 B, 7B 65H 67/02 B

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI