Global Patent Index - EP 1158165 A3

EP 1158165 A3 2001-12-12 - Gyrotor hydraulic motor

Title (en)

Gyrotor hydraulic motor

Title (de)

Gerotor-Hydraulikmotor

Title (fr)

Moteur hydraulique du type gerotor

Publication

EP 1158165 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01112161 A

Priority

US 57916400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1158165A2] A multi-speed gerotor motor of the type including a fluid displacement mechanism (21) defining expanding (33E) and contracting (33C) fluid volume chambers, a stationary valve member (19), defining a plurality N of stationary valve passages, and a movable valve member (43). The upstream end of each valve passage communicates with the movable valve member (43), and the downstream end of each valve passage communicates with one of the volume chambers. In a plurality M of the stationary valve passages (79A through 79E) the upstream (81) and downstream (83) passage portions are blocked from direct communication, and for each there is a control valve member (103) which can, selectively, permit fluid communication for normal, low-speed, high-torque operation, or can block such communication, and recirculate the associated volume chambers for highspeed, low torque operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03C 2/08 (2006.01); F04C 2/10 (2006.01); F04C 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/08 (2013.01); F03C 2/08 (2013.01); F04C 2/104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1158165 A2 20011128; EP 1158165 A3 20011212; CN 1326048 A 20011212; JP 2001336472 A 20011207

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI