Global Patent Index - EP 1158252 A3

EP 1158252 A3 2002-11-13 - Portable air conditioner

Title (en)

Portable air conditioner

Title (de)

Tragbares Klimaanlagegerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif portable de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1158252 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01111342 A

Priority

ES 200001287 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1158252A2] The first module (1) contains the components for the outside operation of the air conditioner and the second, indoor, unit (2) has brackets (5) to which a fixture (6) on the first unit may be engaged for transportation. Further security is provided by an adjustable hook (10) near the top of the first unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 1/04 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/32 (2013.01); F24F 1/0003 (2013.01); F24F 1/04 (2013.01); F24F 2221/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1158252 A2 20011128; EP 1158252 A3 20021113; ES 2194555 A1 20031116; ES 2194555 B1 20050401

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131203

2005-04-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040406

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI