Global Patent Index - EP 1158849 A2

EP 1158849 A2 2001-12-05 - PLANT LIGAND-GATED ION CHANNELS

Title (en)

PLANT LIGAND-GATED ION CHANNELS

Title (de)

LIGANDEN-GESTEUERTE IONENKANÄLE AUS PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

CANAUX D'IONS DE VEGETAUX DEPENDANT DE LIGANDS

Publication

EP 1158849 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00917697 A

Priority

  • US 0005407 W
  • US 12250699 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0052137A2] Recombinant plant proteins that are expected to function as ligand gated ion-channel proteins, such as GABA receptor proteins, are provided, as are nucleotide sequences encoding these proteins. The invention also provides recombinant vectors including the nucleotide sequences encoding the proteins described herein. Further provided are plant host cells that include the recombinant vectors described herein, transgenic plants and methods of using the nucleotide and amino acid sequences described herein, including methods of treating plants, method of expressing the proteins described herein, methods of modifying receptor activity in a plant and methods of regulating plant metabolism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01H 1/00; C07H 21/04; C07K 14/415; C12N 5/14; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/415 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/415 (2013.01); C12N 15/8241 (2013.01); C12N 15/8261 (2013.01); Y02A 40/146 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0052137 A2 20000908; WO 0052137 A3 20010215; AU 3863000 A 20000921; AU 776896 B2 20040923; CA 2364596 A1 20000908; EP 1158849 A2 20011205; EP 1158849 A4 20030730; IL 145233 D0 20020630; JP 2002541780 A 20021210; MX PA01008846 A 20031014; NZ 514010 A 20040227

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050920

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-07-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01H 1/00 A

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/415 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/14 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/00 B

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/82 B

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI