Global Patent Index - EP 1158880 A1

EP 1158880 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING BRUSHWARE AND BRUSHWARE OBTAINED WITH SAME

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING BRUSHWARE AND BRUSHWARE OBTAINED WITH SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BORSTENWAREN UND DANACH HERGESTELLTE BORSTENWAREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE DES ARTICLES DE BROSSERIE ET ARTICLES DE BROSSERIE AINSI OBTENUS

Publication

EP 1158880 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00910706 A

Priority

  • DE 19909435 A
  • EP 0001533 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909435A1] The invention relates to a method for the production of brushware articles consisting of a bristle support and bristles of at least two different types which are gathered into at least one group having a defined cross section and fixed to the support. According to said method the bristles of a particular type are gathered into a partial group and the partial groups forming a whole bristle group are gathered to form a bristle group which is then fixed to the bristle support. In a guide of a shaping device the cross section of the bristles of each partial group is deformed such that this cross section corresponds to their partial cross section in the bristle group. While ensuring that the partial groups retain their partial cross sections, said partial groups are then gathered in the guides such that the cross section of the bristle group is obtained. The invention also relates to a device for carrying the above method and to brushware obtained with same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/04; A46D 1/06; A46D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2006.01); A46D 1/06 (2006.01); A46D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0051462A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909435 A1 20000907; AR 022838 A1 20020904; AT 265164 T 20040515; AU 3282000 A 20000921; AU 758677 B2 20030327; AU 758677 C 20031009; BR 0008742 A 20020108; CA 2362595 A1 20000908; CN 1145442 C 20040414; CN 1342048 A 20020327; CZ 20013125 A3 20020313; CZ 300258 B6 20090401; EG 22879 A 20031030; EP 1158880 A1 20011205; EP 1158880 B1 20040428; HU 0200098 A2 20020529; JP 2002537880 A 20021112; NO 20014271 A 20011101; NO 20014271 D0 20010903; PL 350320 A1 20021202; RU 2233605 C2 20040810; TR 200102571 T2 20020121; TW 427890 B 20010401; US 6726789 B1 20040427; WO 0051462 A1 20000908; ZA 200107073 B 20030226

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120224

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120224

2012-09-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTERBROS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GERRESHEIMER WILDEN AG SCHWEIZ, KUESSNACHT, CH

- Document: DE 50006246

- Effective date: 20120724

2012-09-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006246

- Representative's name: LICHTI PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120724

2012-09-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006246

- Representative's name: LICHTI - PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120724

2012-07-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006246

- Representative's name: LICHTI PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110311

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040928

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CORONET-WERKE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CORONET-WERKE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-02-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-02-24 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-08-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040808

2004-07-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006246 P 20040603

2004-06-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE