Global Patent Index - EP 1158909 A1

EP 1158909 A1 2001-12-05 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR UNIFORM TRANSCUTANEOUS THERAPEUTIC ULTRASOUND

Title (en)

METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR UNIFORM TRANSCUTANEOUS THERAPEUTIC ULTRASOUND

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNIFORMEN, TRANSKUTANEN THERAPIE MITTELS ULTRASCHALL

Title (fr)

METHODES ET APPAREIL DESTINES A LA THERAPIE TRANSCUTANEE PAR CHAMPS UNIFORME D'ULTRASONS

Publication

EP 1158909 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00914604 A

Priority

  • US 0003990 W
  • US 25529099 A
  • US 36461699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0048518A1] A wide beam ultrasound delivery system providing a uniform exposure field is used to enhance the uptake of injected substances and/or to enhance the transfection of DNA in the tissues of human subject, or reduce the amount of vascular intimal hyperplasia in human subjects following vascular injury.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 18/00 (2006.01); A61M 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 37/0092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0048518 A1 20000824; WO 0048518 A9 20010927; AU 3597100 A 20000904; BR 0008397 A 20020205; CA 2361150 A1 20000824; EP 1158909 A1 20011205; EP 1158909 A4 20030205; JP 2002537013 A 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041027

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-02-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021219

2001-12-19 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010925;LT PAYMENT 20010925;LV PAYMENT 20010925;MK PAYMENT 20010925;RO PAYMENT 20010925;SI PAYMENT 20010925