Global Patent Index - EP 1158956 A1

EP 1158956 A1 2001-12-05 - OIL BATHS

Title (en)

OIL BATHS

Title (de)

ÖLBÄDER

Title (fr)

BAINS D'HUILES

Publication

EP 1158956 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00922492 A

Priority

  • DE 19910704 A
  • EP 0001814 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19910704A1] The invention relates to novel cosmetic preparations for the utilisation in hair care and skin care. Said preparations are free of alkanolamides and consist of: (a) 30 to 70 wt. % of a mixture of, (a1) fatty acid (polyglycol) esters, (a2) fatty alcohol polyglycol ethers, (a3) polyoles, (a4) alkyl oligo glycosides and/or alkylene oligo glycosides and (b) 70 to 30 wt. % oil bodies with the proviso that the quantities indicated amount to 100 wt. %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 43/13 (2006.01); C07C 305/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 19/10 (2013.01); A61K 8/345 (2013.01); A61K 8/37 (2013.01); A61K 8/375 (2013.01); A61K 8/39 (2013.01); A61K 8/463 (2013.01); A61K 8/922 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053156A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19910704 A1 20000914; DE 19910704 B4 20060420; EP 1158956 A1 20011205; JP 2002538193 A 20021112; WO 0053156 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041116

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE