Global Patent Index - EP 1158975 A1

EP 1158975 A1 2001-12-05 - USE OF ISOFLAVONES AND/OR AFRICAN PLUM EXTRACTS FOR PREPARING A COMPOSITION DESIGNED TO INHIBIT 5$G(A)-REDUCTASE ACTIVITY, IN PHARMACOLOGY PARTICULARLY IN DERMATOLOGY, IN COSMETICS AND AS FOOD ADDITIVE

Title (en)

USE OF ISOFLAVONES AND/OR AFRICAN PLUM EXTRACTS FOR PREPARING A COMPOSITION DESIGNED TO INHIBIT 5$G(A)-REDUCTASE ACTIVITY, IN PHARMACOLOGY PARTICULARLY IN DERMATOLOGY, IN COSMETICS AND AS FOOD ADDITIVE

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON ISOFLAVONEN ODER PYGEUMEXTRACT ZUR HEMMUNG VON 5SS-REDUCTASE

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'ISOFLAVONES ET/OU D'EXTRAITS DE PRUNIER D'AFRIQUE POUR LA PREPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DESTINEE A INHIBER L'ACTIVITE DE LA 5$g(a)-REDUCTASE, EN PHARMACIE NOTAMMENT EN DERMATOLOGIE, EN COSMETIQUE ET EN TANT QU'ADDITIF ALIMENTAIRE

Publication

EP 1158975 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01907635 A

Priority

  • FR 0100170 W
  • FR 0000573 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0152840A1] The invention concerns the use of at least a product selected from the group consisting of isoflavones, African plum extracts and the mixtures thereof for preparing a composition designed to inhibit 5 alpha -reductase activity. Said use produces a remarkable inhibiting effect of 5 alpha -reductase activity thereby providing a novel response for treating dermatological pathologies and/or disorders related to congenital or acquired exaggeration of 5 alpha -reductase activity, in particular for treating prostatic hypertrophy, prostatic adenoma, acne, hyperseborrhea, alopecia and hirsutism. The invention also concerns cosmetic treatment methods, in particular for greasy skin, and the use of said products as additives for a food product for human or animal consumption.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/352; A61K 35/78; A61P 13/08; A61P 17/10; A61P 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/97 (2006.01); A61K 31/352 (2006.01); A61K 31/353 (2006.01); A61K 31/7048 (2006.01); A61K 36/00 (2006.01); A61K 36/48 (2006.01); A61K 36/736 (2006.01); A61P 13/08 (2006.01); A61P 17/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/14 (2006.01); A61Q 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 7/02 (2013.01); A61K 8/498 (2013.01); A61K 8/97 (2013.01); A61K 31/352 (2013.01); A61K 31/353 (2013.01); A61K 31/7048 (2013.01); A61K 36/48 (2013.01); A61K 36/736 (2013.01); A61K 2800/782 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/353 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 36/736 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0152840A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0152840 A1 20010726; AU 3555101 A 20010731; EP 1158975 A1 20011205; FR 2803747 A1 20010720; FR 2803747 B1 20031226

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LABORATOIRES EXPANSCIENCE

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020121

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI