Global Patent Index - EP 1158991 A1

EP 1158991 A1 2001-12-05 - TREATMENT OF ASTHMA

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF ASTHMA

Title (de)

ASTHMABEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DE L'ASTHME

Publication

EP 1158991 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00911507 A

Priority

  • NZ 0000027 W
  • NZ 33466499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054783A1] The invention provides a respiratorially-administrable vaccine for use in treating asthma. The vaccines of the invention comprise lipoaribinomannan (LAM) in an immunogenic form.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/739

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/739 (2006.01); A61K 39/04 (2006.01); A61K 39/35 (2006.01); A61K 38/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/35 (2013.01); A61K 31/739 (2013.01); A61K 39/04 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/543 (2013.01); A61K 2039/544 (2013.01); A61K 2039/57 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054783 A1 20000921; AU 3337300 A 20001004; CA 2367447 A1 20000921; EP 1158991 A1 20011205; EP 1158991 A4 20030514

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040615

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040204

2003-05-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/739 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 35/74 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 11/06 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 37/08 B

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE MALAGHAN INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNIVERSITY OF OTAGO

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGRESEARCH LIMITED

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011003

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI