Global Patent Index - EP 1158999 A2

EP 1158999 A2 2001-12-05 - METHODS FOR IMPROVING GRAFT ACCEPTANCE IN A RECIPIENT BY ADMINISTRATION OF A CYTOKINE PROFILE ALTERING AGENT

Title (en)

METHODS FOR IMPROVING GRAFT ACCEPTANCE IN A RECIPIENT BY ADMINISTRATION OF A CYTOKINE PROFILE ALTERING AGENT

Title (de)

METHODEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER AKZEPTANZ VON TRANSPLANTATEN IN EINEM EMPFÄNGER DURCH ANWENDUNG EINER SUBSTANZ DIE DAS ZYTOKINPROFIL VERÄNDERT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'AMELIORATION D'ACCEPTATION DE GREFFE CHEZ UN RECEVEUR PAR L'ADMINISTRATION D'UN AGENT MODIFICATEUR DU PROFILE DE LA CYTOKINE

Publication

EP 1158999 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00921362 A

Priority

  • US 0005647 W
  • US 26301199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0051630A2] Methods for improving graft acceptance in a recipient by administration of a cytokine profile altering agent are disclosed. The methods involve biasing the cytokine response in a graft recipient to one dominated by Th2 cytokines either by increasing Th2 cytokine production or by decreasing Th1 cytokine production by administering an isolated cell and a cytokine profile altering agent to the subject to thereby promote acceptance of the graft in the subject.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/20; A61K 39/395; A61P 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/20 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/24 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2015.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/2026 (2013.01); A61K 38/2066 (2013.01); A61K 39/001 (2013.01); C07K 16/244 (2013.01); C07K 16/246 (2013.01); C07K 16/249 (2013.01); A61K 35/12 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); A61K 2035/122 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); A61K 2039/515 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5156 (2013.01); A61K 2039/57 (2013.01); C07K 2317/73 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0051630A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0051630 A2 20000908; WO 0051630 A3 20010118; AU 4169800 A 20000921; CA 2364279 A1 20000908; EP 1158999 A2 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030902

2002-05-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EDGE, ALBERT

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EDGE, ALBERT

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI