Global Patent Index - EP 1159023 A1

EP 1159023 A1 2001-12-05 - DIRECTIONAL GUIDEWIRE

Title (en)

DIRECTIONAL GUIDEWIRE

Title (de)

GEBOGENER FÜHRUNGSDRAHT

Title (fr)

FIL-GUIDE DIRECTIONNEL

Publication

EP 1159023 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99968551 A

Priority

  • AU PP907599 A
  • US 9930974 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0053250A1] A Directable Medical Guidewire having two ends and an outer surface for insertion through a lumen comprising: an elongate resiliently flexible body having a main portion biased into a first configuration; and, an end portion contiguous with one end of the main portion defined by a curved configuration having a first section with a first curvature and a second section having a second different curvature to that of the first section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 25/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/01 (2006.01); A61M 25/09 (2006.01); A61M 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/09 (2013.01); A61M 25/0041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053250A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0053250 A1 20000914; WO 0053250 A9 20020822; AU PP907599 A0 19990401; CA 2362671 A1 20000914; EP 1159023 A1 20011205; JP 2003530132 A 20031014

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WHITE, GEOFFREY, H.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YU, WEIYUN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FOSTER, STU

2006-03-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050830

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENDOGAD RESEARCH PTY LIMITED

2005-06-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WHITE, GEOFFREY, H.

2005-06-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YU, WEIYUN

2005-06-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FOSTER, STU

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040225

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI