Global Patent Index - EP 1159053 A1

EP 1159053 A1 2001-12-05 - FLUID FILTER CARTRIDGE ARRANGEMENT AND ADAPTER

Title (en)

FLUID FILTER CARTRIDGE ARRANGEMENT AND ADAPTER

Title (de)

FLUIDFILTERPATRONENANORDNUNG UND ANSCHLUSSTÜCK

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET ADAPTATEUR DE CARTOUCHE DE FILTRE A LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 1159053 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00974683 A

Priority

  • GB 0004318 W
  • GB 9926747 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2356156A] A quick connect cartridge for fuel lines comprises a spin-on filter (figure 5, plan view) with radial 40 and central 46 openings, wherein the central opening 46 has spin-on coupling means 48, and a cap 50 with two quick connect coupling elements 18, 20 wherein the elements communicate with the radial and central openings respectively. The cap 50 preferably has a convex outer surface 52 and a concave inner surface 54 that defines a chamber 56 which communicates one of the quick connect coupling elements 18 to the radial openings 40 of the filter 12. This chamber 56 is isolated from the second quick connect coupling element 20 The second quick connect coupling element 20 preferably communicates with an annular threaded lug 64 on the cap 50 allowing it to make a threaded connection with a screw thread 48 located in the filter's central opening 46. Fuel resistant adhesives 84, 86 which also serve as seals may bond an annular flange 70 on the cap 50 to a crimped end 80 of the filter 12 and may bond the threaded connection 48, 66. The quick connect coupling element 20 which communicates with the central opening 46 of the filter is preferably aligned with the opening whilst the other element 20 is disposed radially thereof. Both quick connect coupling elements 18, 20 are preferably tubes with annular ribs 22, 24.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 27/08; B01D 35/30; F02M 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 27/08 (2006.01); B01D 35/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 35/306 (2013.01); B01D 27/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0134271A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

GB 2356156 A 20010516; GB 2356156 B 20031217; GB 9926747 D0 20000112; AU 1290101 A 20010606; EP 1159053 A1 20011205; WO 0134271 A1 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031209

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI