Global Patent Index - EP 1159075 A1

EP 1159075 A1 2001-12-05 - CENTRIFUGAL ATOMIZER

Title (en)

CENTRIFUGAL ATOMIZER

Title (de)

ZENTRIFUGALZERSTÄUBER

Title (fr)

ATOMISEUR CENTRIFUGE

Publication

EP 1159075 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00909066 A

Priority

  • DK 0000101 W
  • DK PA199900344 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0053333A1] A centrifugal atomizer comprises an atomizer wheel (29) mounted on a driven shaft (28) and defining an acceleration chamber (35), where liquid is fed in said acceleration chamber through a stationary, annular distribution member (30) and a corresponding annular opening (27) in the atomizer wheel. The liquid is ejected in form of a spray from the atomizer wheel (29) through openings (16) distributed in circumferential direction. A sealing means is associated with passages (36, 37) provided between the distribution members (30) and the respective sides of the corresponding opening (27) in the atomizer wheel (29). The sealing means comprises a stationary, circumferential and projecting rib (40, 41), which projects radially inwards into a quantity of a sealing liquid in an annular groove (38, 39). The annular groove is adapted to rotate together with the atomizer wheel (29), means being provided for feeding said groove with sealing liquid and removing said sealing liquid again, respectively, during operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/1057 (2013.01); B05B 3/1021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053333A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0053333 A1 20000914; DE 60004330 D1 20030911; DK 1159075 T3 20031201; EP 1159075 A1 20011205; EP 1159075 B1 20030806

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2007-11-12 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-03-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-12-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-11-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60004330 P 20030911

2003-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB IE

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE