Global Patent Index - EP 1159088 A1

EP 1159088 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNLOADING A POSTAL CONTAINER THAT HAS AN OPEN TOP

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNLOADING A POSTAL CONTAINER THAT HAS AN OPEN TOP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLADEN EINES OBEN OFFENEN SENDUNGSBEHÄLTERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DECHARGEMENT D'UN CONTENEUR POSTAL OUVERT EN HAUT

Publication

EP 1159088 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00908958 A

Priority

  • DE 0000268 W
  • DE 19905955 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19905955C1] A method of unloading a postal items container which opens at the top and has obliquely outward-extending, side walls, involves initially receiving the container into a tiltable retaining- and positioning- device, compressing the stack of postal items in the horizontally aligned postal container, inserting swivelling and traversable retainer-supports which have rotatable conveyor belts which are driven so that sections of the belts touching the postal items are motionless relative to these items. The postal container, when full, is swivelled with the retainer supports through greater than 90 deg. to support the stack of postal items on the side wall of the container, prior to swivelling the container backwards again sufficient for a base plate to be inserted between the container and the stacked postal items. The container based plate and the stack of postal items, which are clamped between the retainer supports, are then swivelled back again into a horizontal position for the postal items, and the container is then released from the retaining- and positioning device and removed. A control unit and sensors are used to carry out the various steps.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 69/00 (2006.01); B07C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 1/02 (2013.01); B65H 2301/422542 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0047341A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19905955 C1 20000511; EP 1159088 A1 20011205; EP 1159088 B1 20020717; JP 2002536256 A 20021029; US 6634846 B1 20031021; WO 0047341 A1 20000817

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS DEMATIC A.G.

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080215

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080410

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080211

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000289 20020822

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE