Global Patent Index - EP 1159097 A1

EP 1159097 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD FOR FORMING METAL PARTS BY COLD DEFORMATION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FORMING METAL PARTS BY COLD DEFORMATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERFORMEN METALLISCHER WERKSTÜCKE DURCH KALTVERFORMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FORMAGE DE PIECES METALLIQUES PAR DEFORMATION A FROID

Publication

EP 1159097 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00910954 A

Priority

  • FR 0000630 W
  • FR 9903155 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2790983A1] The invention concerns a method for forming metal parts by cold deformation, consisting in: (i) mechanically depositing a metal zinc layer on the free surface of the blank of the part to be produced; and (ii) forming said part by plastic deformation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 3/00; C23C 24/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/32 (2006.01); B21C 37/04 (2006.01); B21J 1/02 (2006.01); B21J 3/00 (2006.01); C23C 24/04 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/3225 (2013.01); B21C 23/32 (2013.01); B21C 37/042 (2013.01); B21J 3/00 (2013.01); C23C 24/04 (2013.01); C23C 28/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054907A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790983 A1 20000922; FR 2790983 B1 20010622; AT 219397 T 20020715; AU 3298500 A 20001004; BR 0009003 A 20020102; CA 2368062 A1 20000921; CA 2368062 C 20080923; CZ 20013309 A3 20020515; CZ 296833 B6 20060614; DE 60000228 D1 20020725; DE 60000228 T2 20030227; EP 1159097 A1 20011205; EP 1159097 B1 20020619; ES 2177512 T3 20021216; HU 0200233 A2 20020529; JP 2002538969 A 20021119; MX PA01009377 A 20030606; PL 198112 B1 20080530; PL 354612 A1 20040209; TR 200102686 T2 20020321; US 6598441 B1 20030729; WO 0054907 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180417

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180409

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130315

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *DACRAL

- Effective date: 20070331

2006-04-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060403

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-04-01 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030401

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-15 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-02-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1159097E

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177512 T3

2002-09-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-09-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-09-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000228 20020725

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20011001;SI PAYMENT 20011001

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2002-06-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219397 T 20020715

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011210

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20011001;SI PAYMENT 20011001