Global Patent Index - EP 1159102 A1

EP 1159102 A1 2001-12-05 - LOCKING CHUCK

Title (en)

LOCKING CHUCK

Title (de)

SPANNFUTTER

Title (fr)

MANDRIN DE BLOCAGE

Publication

EP 1159102 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99965252 A

Priority

  • US 9929631 W
  • US 21162298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0035619A1] A tool driver includes a housing (30) and a rotatable drive shaft (28). A chuck (10) for holding the tool includes a generally cylindrical body (12) having a nose section (80) and a tail section (82). Jaws (16) are slidably positioned in angularly disposed passageways (42) in the body (12). Each jaw (16) has a jaw face (34) and threads (36) formed thereon. A nut (18) is in operative communication with the drive shaft (28) so that the drive shaft (28) rotationally drives the nut (18). The nut (18) engages the jaw threads (36) so that rotation of the nut (18) moves the jaws (16) axially within the passageways (42). A locking mechanism (20, 48) is mounted to at least one of the housing (30) and the body (12) and is selectively actuatable to first and second operative positions. In the first position, the locking mechanism (20, 48) rotationally locks the housing (30) and the body (12) with respect to each other. In the second, it permits relative rotation between the body (12) and the housing (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23B 31/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23B 31/1246 (2013.01); B23B 31/123 (2013.01); B23B 2231/06 (2013.01); B23B 2231/38 (2013.01); Y10S 279/902 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17615 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17632 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17641 (2013.01); Y10T 279/3451 (2013.01); Y10T 408/953 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0035619 A1 20000622; AU 3120700 A 20000703; DE 19983812 T1 20020110; DE 69920523 D1 20041028; DE 69920523 T2 20050929; EP 1159102 A1 20011205; EP 1159102 A4 20020327; EP 1159102 B1 20040922; GB 0114682 D0 20010808; GB 2360963 A 20011010; GB 2360963 B 20030409; TW 415862 B 20001221; US 2001042965 A1 20011122; US 6196554 B1 20010306; US 6241259 B1 20010605; US 6488287 B2 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69920523

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920523 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-03-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE