Global Patent Index - EP 1159113 A1

EP 1159113 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD OF PRODUCING PANEL-SHAPED PRODUCTS

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING PANEL-SHAPED PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN PRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PRODUITS SOUS FORME DE PLAQUES

Publication

EP 1159113 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00910726 A

Priority

  • DE 19909605 A
  • EP 0001662 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909605A1] The invention relates to a method of producing panel-shaped products by hot pressing a binder-containing, laminate shaped body from lignocellulose-containing chips. Different binders are used in the center layer and the cover layers and the cover layers arranged at both sides of the center layer consist of a cover material from wood or from wood-based raw materials that contains aminoplasts and/or phenolic resins. The aim of the invention is to provide a panel-shaped product that can use different raw materials depending on their availability. To this end, the center layer from center layer material containing binders consists of lignocellulose-containing annual plants or mixtures from center layer material from lignocellulose-containing annual plants and wood or other wood-based raw materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/002 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249925 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31989 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053380A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909605 A1 20000907; CA 2362720 A1 20000914; CA 2362720 C 20070109; EP 1159113 A1 20011205; EP 1159113 B1 20050420; US 6652695 B1 20031125; WO 0053380 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50010110

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140131

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DIEFFENBACHER GMBH + CO. KG, 75031 EPPINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50010110

- Effective date: 20120302

2012-04-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50010110

- Representative's name: HARTDEGEN, ANTON, DIPL.-ING.(FH), DE

- Effective date: 20120302

2012-03-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50010110

- Representative's name: ANTON HARTDEGEN, DE

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-07-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010110 P 20050525

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2005-04-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEFFENBACHER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE