Global Patent Index - EP 1159114 A1

EP 1159114 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD OF PRODUCING PANEL-SHAPED PRODUCTS

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING PANEL-SHAPED PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN PRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REALISATION DE PRODUITS SOUS FORME DE PANNEAUX

Publication

EP 1159114 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00920452 A

Priority

  • DE 19909607 A
  • EP 0001661 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909607A1] The invention relates to a method of producing panel-shaped products by hot pressing a binder-containing, laminate shaped body from chips of lignocellulose-containing annual plants. The aim of the invention is to avoid the problem of adherence when using isocyanate as the binder. To this end, the cover layer material is divided into a cover material fine fraction (5a) and a cover material coarse fraction (5b). Said cover material fine fraction (5a) is pre-mixed with bonding agents and/or wetting agents and/or acids and/or bases. The aminoplasts and/or phenoplasts are then applied by gluing. Isocyanate or mixtures of isocyanate and aminoplasts and/or phenoplasts are applied on said cover material coarse fraction (5b) by gluing. A five-layered shaped product is prepared by dispersion, the outer cover layer consisting of cover material fine fractions glued with aminoplasts and/or phenoplasts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 3/00; B27N 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/00 (2006.01); B27N 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/002 (2013.01); B27N 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053379A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909607 A1 20000907; CA 2362718 A1 20000914; CA 2362718 C 20070102; EP 1159114 A1 20011205; EP 1159114 B1 20031022; US 6767421 B1 20040727; WO 0053379 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040122

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004152 P 20031127

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-10-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE