Global Patent Index - EP 1159139 A1

EP 1159139 A1 2001-12-05 - TACTILE MARKINGS FOR BANKNOTES AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME

Title (en)

TACTILE MARKINGS FOR BANKNOTES AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME

Title (de)

ERTASTBARE MARKIERUNGEN FÜR GELDSCHEINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MARQUES TACTILES POUR BILLETS DE BANQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1159139 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00907390 A

Priority

  • CA 0000229 W
  • CA 2263616 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2263616A1] A sheet material, such as a bank note, having tactile indicia therein, the tactility of which is resistant to deterioration and useful for assisting persons with impaired vision to identify one or more predetermined characteristics of the sheet material such as a bank note. The sheet material has therein at least one embossment forming the indicia and comprises a first surface and a second surface, with one of the surfaces defining a cavity in the area of the embossment. A layer of reinforcing material is provided to at least the area of that surface which comprises the cavity. Once the reinforcing material is dried and/or cured the embossment (indicia) is strengthened by the layer of reinforcing material and thereby rendered more durable when the bank note is subjected to the wear of circulation. The reinforcing material may be selected from the group consisting of varnishes, inks, adhesives and caulking compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 3/16; B41M 7/00; B42D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/16 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 7/02 (2013.01); B41M 3/16 (2013.01); B42D 25/29 (2014.10); B42D 25/324 (2014.10); B42D 25/425 (2014.10); B42D 25/455 (2014.10); B42D 25/46 (2014.10); B41M 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0051824A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

CA 2263616 A1 20000901; CA 2263616 C 20020514; DE 60002054 D1 20030515; DE 60002054 T2 20040408; EP 1159139 A1 20011205; EP 1159139 B1 20030409; HK 1043963 A1 20040206

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-18 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070205

2007-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-05-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI