Global Patent Index - EP 1159164 A1

EP 1159164 A1 2001-12-05 - RESTRAINING DEVICE FOR PEOPLE IN A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

RESTRAINING DEVICE FOR PEOPLE IN A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

PERSONEN-RÜCKHALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE PERSONNES DANS UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 1159164 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00989924 A

Priority

  • DE 19958152 A
  • DE 10007404 A
  • DE 10007407 A
  • EP 0012006 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0140029A1] The invention relates to a restraining device for people. The inventive device is used in the passenger cell of a motor vehicle and is provided with at least one impact protection element and a releasing device that operates the impact protection element when there is an impact. The impact protection element is provided with at least one security cushion (9; 7'; 5") that is compressed when the releasing device is in the non-activated initial state. Said cushion can be released for expanding by means of the releasing device. According to the invention, the security cushion (9; 7'; 5") is enclosed in a sleeve (11; 8'; 6") when in the compressed state (9a). The sleeve (11; 8'; 6") releases the security cushion (9; 7'; 5") for expansion when the releasing device is in the active state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 21/16; B60R 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/045 (2006.01); B60R 21/05 (2006.01); B60R 21/203 (2006.01); B60R 21/205 (2011.01); B60R 21/16 (2006.01); B60R 21/215 (2011.01); B60R 21/231 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/203 (2013.01); B60R 21/045 (2013.01); B60R 21/05 (2013.01); B60R 21/205 (2013.01); B60R 21/206 (2013.01); B60R 2021/21525 (2013.01); B60R 2021/23169 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0140029A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0140029 A1 20010607; AU 2670601 A 20010612; EP 1159164 A1 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051229

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040220

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI