Global Patent Index - EP 1159183 A1

EP 1159183 A1 2001-12-05 - RAIL SWITCH LOCK FOR POINTS TONGUES

Title (en)

RAIL SWITCH LOCK FOR POINTS TONGUES

Title (de)

WEICHENVERSCHLUSS FÜR WEICHENZUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE D'AIGUILLE POUR LAMES D'AIGUILLE

Publication

EP 1159183 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00993777 A

Priority

  • DE 10000804 A
  • EP 0013318 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151332A1] The invention relates to a rail switch lock for points tongues (2, 3). The inventive lock comprises at least one locking component (6, 7) for fixing to a rigid rail (4, 5), at least one tongue attachment (8, 9) for fixing to a points tongue (2, 3) and a slide rod (10). The regulating distance of the slide rod (10) is greater than the tongue span (Z) of the points tongue (2, 3) and the points tongue (2, 3) is locked on the rigid rail (4, 5) in one final position thereof. At least one bearing roller (17, 18) is provided on the locking component. The slide rod (10) can be moved in relation to the locking component (6, 7) by means of the bearing roller (17, 18) for adjusting the points tongue (2, 3). The aim of the invention is to provide a rail switch lock that requires only little and essentially constant actuating powers and can be attended and lubricated in a more simple manner. According to the invention, a bell-crank lever (19, 20) that rolls on or along the bearing roller (17, 18) and is articulated to the slide rod (10) and the tongue attachment (8, 9) is provided. Said bell-crank lever (19, 20) engages with the bearing roller (17, 18) in such a way that said bell-crank lever (19, 20) pivots around the point of articulation on the tongue attachment (8, 9) with the free end thereof when the slide rod (10) is adjusted and the points tongue (2, 3) is in the locked state for locking and adjusting the points tongue (2, 3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0151332A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151332 A1 20010719; AT 225727 T 20021015; AU 2844101 A 20010724; AU 764345 B2 20030814; CZ 20013191 A3 20020116; CZ 291421 B6 20030312; DE 10000804 A1 20010726; EP 1159183 A1 20011205; EP 1159183 B1 20021009; PL 197909 B1 20080530; US 2002157561 A1 20021031; US 6616105 B2 20030909

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151229

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 225727 T

- Effective date: 20151229

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-09-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: L.B. FOSTER GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 225727 T

- Effective date: 20150805

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2015-03-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: L.B. FOSTER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BALFOUR BEATTY RAIL GMBH, DE

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-12-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: L.B. FOSTER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BALFOUR BEATTY RAIL GMBH, 81373 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50000621

- Effective date: 20141121

2014-12-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000621

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2014-12-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000621

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20141121

2014-11-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000621

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2013-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: BALFOUR BEATTY RAIL GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 225727 T

- Effective date: 20130307

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000621

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2012-11-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BALFOUR BEATTY RAIL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHRECK-MIEVES GMBH, DE

2012-10-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BALFOUR BEATTY RAIL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHRECK-MIEVES GMBH, 44225 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 50000621

- Effective date: 20120912

2012-10-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: L.B. FOSTER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHRECK-MIEVES GMBH, 44225 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 50000621

- Effective date: 20120912

2012-10-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000621

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE GESTHUYSEN, VON ROHR & EGGERT, DE

- Effective date: 20120912

2012-10-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000621

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120912

2012-09-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000621

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE GESTHUYSEN, VON ROHR & EGGERT, DE

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101229

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101229

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101229

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHRECK-MIEVES G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20101231

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-07-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1159183E

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20021009

2003-01-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030109

2003-01-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030109

2003-01-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030109

2002-12-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021229

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000621 20021114

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225727 T 20021015

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI