Global Patent Index - EP 1159197 A1

EP 1159197 A1 2001-12-05 - DEVICE FOR TENSIONING AND CLOSING TIGHTENING STRAPS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR TENSIONING AND CLOSING TIGHTENING STRAPS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPANNEN UND VERSCHLIESSEN VON UMREIFUNGSBÄNDERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR TENDRE ET FERMER DES BANDES DE CERCLAGE

Publication

EP 1159197 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00902648 A

Priority

  • DE 19909620 A
  • EP 0000807 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909620A1] The invention relates to a device for tensioning and closing plastic tightening straps, wherein one end (20) of the strap is guided between a tensioning wheel (13) and a self-adjusting separating element (15) and the other end (21) of the strap is guided between the separating element (15) and a pressure plate (14) that can be displaced in the direction of the tensioning wheel. In order to easily reopen the device after successfully tensioning and welding the ends of the strap with the purpose of removing said strap, an unblocking element (32) is assigned to the separating element (15) that displaces the separating element from its position relative to the tensioning wheel or the pressure plate almost parallel to both ends (20, 21) of the strap during lifting of the pressure plate (14) so that even after a minor ventilation or opening movement the separating element no longer presses the corresponding end (20) of the strap against the tensioning wheel thereby making it possible for said end of the strap to be disengaged from the tensioning wheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/22; B65B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/02 (2006.01); B65B 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/025 (2013.01); B65B 13/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053500A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909620 A1 20000907; AU 2440900 A 20000928; AU 760079 B2 20030508; BR 0008611 A 20020102; EP 1159197 A1 20011205; EP 1159197 B1 20030528; US 6516715 B1 20030211; WO 0053500 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110202

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002353

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100215

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002353 P 20030703

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020107

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE