Global Patent Index - EP 1159202 A1

EP 1159202 A1 2001-12-05 - POURING DEVICE FOR A CANISTER-TYPE CONTAINER

Title (en)

POURING DEVICE FOR A CANISTER-TYPE CONTAINER

Title (de)

AUSGIESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN KANISTERARTIGEN BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF VERSEUR POUR UN CONTENANT DE TYPE BIDON

Publication

EP 1159202 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912243 A

Priority

  • AT 0000059 W
  • AT 45499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0055059A1] The invention relates to a pouring device for a canister-type container (1), comprising a pouring neck (4) which can be closed with a sealing cap (6) and which liquid-tightly accommodates a retaining ring (7) for a ventilation pipe (8). Said ventilation pipe is at least approximately axially parallel to the retaining ring (7) and is joined to the retaining ring (7) at least in the upper peripheral section thereof in relation to the pouring-out position. According to the invention, the ventilation pipe (8) is sealed at the end (9) facing away from retaining ring (7) and has at least one through opening (10) in the area of what is the upper peripheral section in the pouring-out position in order to create advantageous pouring-out conditions, said through opening opening into the container (1) and having a smaller opening cross-section than the inner cross-section of the pipe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 25/40; B65D 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055059A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0055059 A1 20000921; AT 409851 B 20021227; AT A45499 A 20020415; AU 3407500 A 20001004; DE 50000917 D1 20030123; EP 1159202 A1 20011205; EP 1159202 B1 20021211; US 6382475 B1 20020507; ZA 200001335 B 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080309

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080309

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1159202E

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000917 20030123

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE