Global Patent Index - EP 1159219 A1

EP 1159219 A1 2001-12-05 - COMB PROFILE FOR COMB SUPPORT OF ESCALATORS AND MOVING WALKS

Title (en)

COMB PROFILE FOR COMB SUPPORT OF ESCALATORS AND MOVING WALKS

Title (de)

KAMMPROFIL FÜR KAMMTRÄGER VON ROLLTREPPEN UND ROLLSTEIGEN

Title (fr)

PROFILE-PEIGNE DESTINE A UN SUPPORT-PEIGNE D'ESCALIERS MECANIQUES ET DE TAPIS ROULANTS

Publication

EP 1159219 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00915164 A

Priority

  • DE 19909952 A
  • EP 0001856 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909952A1] The invention relates to a comb profile for comb supports of escalators and moving walks which consists of a plurality of segments that can be linked with the comb support. Individual or several segments can be releasably interlinked outside the comb support. Segments that are juxtaposed with their front faces are functionally joined by tongue and groove joints.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 29/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053521A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909952 A1 20000914; DE 19909952 C2 20010621; AT 271515 T 20040815; AU 3657200 A 20000928; CN 1176006 C 20041117; CN 1343180 A 20020403; EP 1159219 A1 20011205; EP 1159219 B1 20040721; HK 1042884 A1 20050401; JP 2002539054 A 20021119; JP 3735037 B2 20060111; US 2002060126 A1 20020523; US 6454078 B1 20020924; WO 0053521 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150303

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007130 P 20040826

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE