Global Patent Index - EP 1159240 A1

EP 1159240 A1 2001-12-05 - HYDROPEROXIDE DECOMPOSITION PROCESS

Title (en)

HYDROPEROXIDE DECOMPOSITION PROCESS

Title (de)

HYDROPEROXIDZERSETZUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DECOMPOSITION D'HYDROPEROXYDE

Publication

EP 1159240 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909950 A

Priority

US 9905228 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0053550A1] An improved process for decomposing alkyl or aromatic hxdroperoxides to form a decomposition reaction mixture containing the corresponding alcohol and ketone. The improvement relates to decomposing the hydroperoxide by contacting the hydroperoxide with a catalitic amount of a heterogenous catalyst comprised of gold, wherein one or more additional metals selected from Periodic Group VIII is/are also present with gold. Moreover, the catalysts are optinally supported on a suitable support member, such as SiO2, Al2O3, carbon, zirconia, MgO or TiO2. The process may also optionally be run in the presence of hydrogen gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 27/00; C07C 37/08; C07C 45/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/50 (2006.01); B01J 23/52 (2006.01); B01J 23/72 (2006.01); B01J 23/75 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 27/00 (2006.01); C07C 29/132 (2006.01); C07C 35/08 (2006.01); C07C 45/53 (2006.01); C07C 49/385 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/52 (2013.01); C07C 29/132 (2013.01); C07C 45/53 (2013.01); C07C 2601/14 (2017.05)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 29/132 + C07C 35/08

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053550A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0053550 A1 20000914; AU 2903199 A 20000928; BR 9917285 A 20011226; CA 2362261 A1 20000914; CN 1337930 A 20020227; CZ 20013106 A3 20020515; EP 1159240 A1 20011205; JP 2002539097 A 20021119; KR 20020018999 A 20020309; MX PA01009075 A 20020327; PL 357043 A1 20040712; SK 12312001 A3 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-12-01 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: BEDEGBITNL

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INVISTA TECHNOLOGIES S.AE.R.L.

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021122

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT NL