Global Patent Index - EP 1159253 A2

EP 1159253 A2 2001-12-05 - SYNTHESIS OF NITROALCOHOL DIASTEREOMERS

Title (en)

SYNTHESIS OF NITROALCOHOL DIASTEREOMERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NITROALKOHOL-DIASTEREOMEREN

Title (fr)

SYNTHESE DE DIASTEREOMERES A BASE DE NITROALCOOL

Publication

EP 1159253 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00915838 A

Priority

  • US 0004576 W
  • US 12131299 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0050378A2] The present invention relates to a method of preparing a 1-nitro-3-substituted-3-amino-2-propanol diastereomer represented by Structural Formula (I): In Structural Formula (I), R is an amine protecting group, and R<1> is an amino acid side-chain, a protected amino acid side-chain, a substituted or unsubstituted aliphatic group, a substituted or unsubstituted aromatic group, a substituted or unsubstituted heteroaromatic group, a substituted or unsubstituted aralkyl or a substituted or unsubstituted heteroaralkyl group. The method involves a contacting a 1-nitro-3-substituted-3-amino-2-propanone with a reducing agent to form a mixture of 1-nitro-3-substituted-3-amino-2-propanol diastereomers. The 1-nitro-3-substituted-3-amino-2-propanol diastereomers are then separated by simulated moving bed chromatography to obtain one or more 1-nitro-3-substituted-3-amino-2-propanol diastereomer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 213/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 20/286 (2006.01); B01D 15/00 (2006.01); B01D 15/08 (2006.01); B01J 20/285 (2006.01); B01J 20/291 (2006.01); C07B 57/00 (2006.01); C07C 213/00 (2006.01); C07C 227/02 (2006.01); C07C 227/34 (2006.01); C07C 229/34 (2006.01); C07C 269/06 (2006.01); C07C 271/16 (2006.01); G01N 30/26 (2006.01); G01N 30/46 (2006.01); G01N 30/88 (2006.01); B01D 15/18 (2006.01); C07C 215/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 213/00 (2013.01); B01D 15/185 (2013.01); C07B 2200/07 (2013.01); Y02P 20/55 (2015.11)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 213/00 + C07C 215/08

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0050378A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0050378 A2 20000831; WO 0050378 A3 20010405; AU 3704300 A 20000914; CA 2364266 A1 20000831; EP 1159253 A2 20011205; JP 2002542153 A 20021210

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050412

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNSON MATTHEY PHARMACEUTICAL MATERIALS INC

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMACEUTICAL MATERIALS, INC.,

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021121

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI