Global Patent Index - EP 1159277 A1

EP 1159277 A1 2001-12-05 - CRYSTAL MODIFICATION D OF 8-CYANO-1-CYCLOPROPYL-7- (1S, 6S- 2,8- DIAZABICYCLO- 4.3.0 NONAN-8-YL) -6-FLUORO -1,4-DIHYDRO -4-OXO -3-QUINOLINE CARBOXYLIC ACID

Title (en)

CRYSTAL MODIFICATION D OF 8-CYANO-1-CYCLOPROPYL-7- (1S, 6S- 2,8- DIAZABICYCLO- 4.3.0 NONAN-8-YL) -6-FLUORO -1,4-DIHYDRO -4-OXO -3-QUINOLINE CARBOXYLIC ACID

Title (de)

KRISTALLMODIFIKATION D VON 8-CYAN-1-CYCLOPROPYL-7- (1S, 6S- 2,8- DIAZABICYCLO- 4.3.0 NONAN -8-YL) -6-FLUOR -1,4- DIHYDRO -4-OXO -3-C HINOLINCARBONSÄURE

Title (fr)

MODIFICATION CRISTALLINE D DE L'ACIDE 8-CYANO-1- CYCLOPROPYL -7- (1S, 6S- 2,8- DIAZABICYCLO - 4.3.0 NONAN-8-YL) -6-FLUORO -1,4- DIHYDRO -4-OXO -3-QUINOLEINE -CARBOXYLIQUE

Publication

EP 1159277 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00909167 A

Priority

  • DE 19908448 A
  • EP 0001203 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19908448A1] The invention relates to a defined crystal modification of 8-cyano -1-cyclopropyl -7- (1S, 6S- 2,8- diazabicyclo [4.3.0] nonan-8-yl) -6-fluoro -1,4- dihydro -4-oxo-3- quinoline carboxylic acid, to methods for producing the same and to the use thereof in pharmaceutical formulations. The crystal modification can be distinguished from other crystal modifications of 8-cyano -1-cyclopropyl -7-(1S, 6S-2,8- diazabicyclo [4.3.0] nonan-8-yl) -6-fluoro -1,4-dihydro -4-oxo -3-quinoline carboxylic acid of formula (I) by its characteristic X-ray powder diffractogram and its differential thermodiagram.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 471/04; A61K 31/44; A61P 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 471/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0052010A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

RO

EPO simple patent family

DE 19908448 A1 20000831; AU 3154400 A 20000921; AU 760710 B2 20030522; BR 0008520 A 20011218; CA 2362804 A1 20000908; CN 1217944 C 20050907; CN 1341116 A 20020320; CZ 20013065 A3 20020116; EP 1159277 A1 20011205; HK 1045158 A1 20060421; HU 0200053 A2 20020529; HU 0200053 A3 20030128; IL 144528 D0 20020523; JP 2002538159 A 20021112; NO 20014059 A 20010821; NO 20014059 D0 20010821; NO 320314 B1 20051121; NZ 513749 A 20031031; PL 349394 A1 20020715; RU 2248357 C2 20050320; SK 11942001 A3 20011203; TR 200102435 T2 20020121; UA 71606 C2 20011217; US 6492391 B1 20021210; WO 0052010 A1 20000908; ZA 200106050 B 20020724

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CRYSTAL MODIFICATION D OF 8-CYANO-1-CYCLOPROPYL-7- (1S, 6S- 2,8- DIAZABICYCLO- 4.3.0 NONAN-8-YL) -6-FLUORO -1,4-DIHYDRO -4-OXO -3-QUINOLINE CARBOXYLIC ACID

2005-09-21 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050729

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE AG

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030910

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20010926;SI