Global Patent Index - EP 1159286 A1

EP 1159286 A1 2001-12-05 - TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTORS 6 ALPHA AND 6 BETA

Title (en)

TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTORS 6 ALPHA AND 6 BETA

Title (de)

TUMORNEKROSEFAKTOR-REZEPTOREN 6 ALPHA UND 6 BETA

Title (fr)

RECEPTEURS DU FACTEUR DE NECROSE TUMORALE 6 ALPHA ET 6 BETA

Publication

EP 1159286 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00916071 A

Priority

  • US 0005686 W
  • US 12177499 P
  • US 12409299 P
  • US 13127999 P
  • US 13196499 P
  • US 14637199 P
  • US 16823599 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0052028A1] The present invention relates to novel Tumor Necrosis Factor Receptor proteins. In particular, isolated nucleic acid molecules are provided encoding the human TNFR-6 alpha and -6 beta proteins. TNFR-6 alpha and -6 beta polypeptides are also provided as are vectors, host cells and recombinant methods for producing the same. The invention further relates to screening methods for identifying agonists and antagonists of TNFR-6 alpha and -6 beta activity. Also provided are diagnostic methods for detecting immune system-related disorders and therapeutic methods for treating immune system-related disorders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07K 14/00; C12N 5/00; C12N 5/06; C12N 15/63; C12P 21/00; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 5/14 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/08 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 9/14 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/715 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/7151 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0052028 A1 20000908; AU 3723400 A 20000921; AU 774845 B2 20040708; CA 2362929 A1 20000908; CN 1345329 A 20020417; EP 1159286 A1 20011205; EP 1159286 A4 20030115; JP 2003512020 A 20030402; KR 20020013506 A 20020220; MX PA01008936 A 20030721; NZ 513294 A 20040430

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-10 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1042498

2007-04-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061003

2005-11-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC.

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-01-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021202

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07K 14/00 A, 7C 12P 21/00 B, 7C 12N 5/00 B, 7C 12N 5/06 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI