Global Patent Index - EP 1159287 A1

EP 1159287 A1 2001-12-05 - 50 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

50 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

50 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES (50)

Publication

EP 1159287 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00917795 A

Priority

  • US 0006049 W
  • US 12414499 P
  • US 13857499 P
  • US 16866799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0055175A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating disorders related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07K 14/00; C07K 16/00; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/85; C12N 15/86; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0055175 A1 20000921; AU 3871300 A 20001004; CA 2364650 A1 20000921; EP 1159287 A1 20011205; EP 1159287 A4 20031105; JP 2002538810 A 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040505

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040423

2003-11-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12P 21/06 A

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12P 21/04 B

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 1/20 B

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/00 B

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/09 B

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/70 B

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/74 B

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/00 B

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/02 B

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI